AZ SB1663 | 2020 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 17-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-11 - House read second time
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-11 - House read second time
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
State permitting dashboard
Title
State permitting dashboard
Sponsors
Sen. David Gowan [R] | Sen. Sonny Borrelli [R] | Sen. Karen Fann [R] | Sen. David Farnsworth [R] |
Sen. Vince Leach [R] | Rep. Leo Biasiucci [R] | Rep. Walter Blackman [R] | Rep. Noel Campbell [R] |
Rep. Mark Finchem [R] | Rep. Gail Griffin [R] | Sen. Anthony Kern [R] | Rep. Jay Lawrence [R] |
Rep. Becky Nutt [R] | Rep. Tony Rivero [R] | Rep. Bob Thorpe [R] | Rep. Ben Toma [R] |
Rep. Jeff Weninger [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-09 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-11 | House | House read second time |
2020-03-10 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2020-03-10 | House | Assigned to House APPROP Committee |
2020-03-10 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2020-03-09 | House | Transmit to House |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (30-0-0-0) |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Senate APPROP Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (9-0-0-0) |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Assigned to Senate APPROP Committee |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Annual Report
Best Practices
Definitions
Delayed Repeal
General Provisions
Purpose
Regulation
Report
Rfe
State Agencies
State Government - Title 41
State Permitting Council
State Permitting Dashboard
State Permitting Director
Strike Everything Amendment
Two-thirds Vote
Best Practices
Definitions
Delayed Repeal
General Provisions
Purpose
Regulation
Report
Rfe
State Agencies
State Government - Title 41
State Permitting Council
State Permitting Dashboard
State Permitting Director
Strike Everything Amendment
Two-thirds Vote