AZ SCR1001 | 2010 | Forty-ninth Legislature 6th Special
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 4 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-02-04 - Transmitted to Secretary Of State
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 4 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-02-04 - Transmitted to Secretary Of State
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Temporary sales tax; repeal
Title
Temporary sales tax; repeal
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Burns [R] | Sen. Ken Cheuvront [D] | Sen. Jorge Garcia [D] | Sen. Linda Gray [R] |
Sen. Barbara Leff [R] | Sen. Linda Lopez [D] | Rep. Stephen Pierce [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-02-04 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-02-04 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-02 - Senate - Senate Natural Resources, Infrastructure and Public Debt Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-04 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-02 - Senate - Senate Natural Resources, Infrastructure and Public Debt Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-04 | Transmitted to Secretary Of State | |
2010-02-04 | Transmit to Senate | |
2010-02-04 | House third reading PASSED voting: (34-25-0-0) | |
2010-02-04 | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass | |
2010-02-04 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-02-04 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-02-04 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-1-0) | |
2010-02-02 | Referred to House RULES Committee | |
2010-02-04 | House APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (9-4-0-0-0) | |
2010-02-03 | Referred to House APPROP Committee | |
2010-02-03 | House read second time | |
2010-02-02 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | |
2010-02-03 | Assigned to House APPROP Committee | |
2010-02-02 | Introduced in House and read first time | |
2010-02-02 | Transmit to House | |
2010-02-02 | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (16-12-0-0) | |
2010-02-02 | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass | |
2010-02-02 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-02-02 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-02-02 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration | |
2010-02-01 | Referred to Senate RULES Committee | |
2010-02-02 | Senate NRIPD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-1-0-0) | |
2010-02-02 | Referred to Senate NRIPD Committee | |
2010-02-02 | Senate read second time | |
2010-02-01 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | |
2010-02-01 | Assigned to Senate NRIPD Committee | |
2010-02-01 | Introduced in Senate and read first time |