CA AB100 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 20, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 20, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 10149 of the Business and Professions Code, to amend Section 19402 of the Elections Code, and to add Article 5.1 (commencing with Section 8589.71) to Chapter 7 of Division 1 of Title 2 of, and to repeal Chapters 12 (commencing with Section 8870), 12.1 (commencing with Section 8871), and Chapters 14 (commencing with Section 8899.10) of Division 1 of Title 2 of, the Government Code, relating to state government, and making an appropriation therefor, to take effect immediately, bill related to the budget.
Title
State government.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-26 - Assembly - AB 100 BUDGET Concurrence in Senate Amendments By TING (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-25 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB100 BUDGET (Ting) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-24 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-24 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Assembly - AB 100 Ting Assembly Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 13 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-25 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB100 BUDGET (Ting) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-24 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-24 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Assembly - AB 100 Ting Assembly Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 13 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-29 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 20, Statutes of 2020. | |
2020-06-29 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2020-06-26 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 6:30 p.m. |
2020-06-26 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 4964.). |
2020-06-26 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Ayes 58. Noes 16. Page 4954.) |
2020-06-25 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after June 27 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2020-06-25 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 3855.). |
2020-06-24 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-06-24 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 1.) (June 24). |
2020-06-22 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2019-09-13 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2019-06-24 | Senate | Ordered to third reading. |
2019-06-24 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 1.) (June 24). |
2019-06-21 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2019-06-20 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2019-06-17 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2019-06-12 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2019-06-10 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2019-04-11 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2019-04-11 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 54. Noes 13. Page 1177.) |
2019-04-08 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-04-04 | Assembly | Ordered to second reading. |
2019-04-04 | Assembly | Withdrawn from committee. |
2019-04-04 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 96 suspended. (Ayes 53. Noes 15. Page 1032.) |
2019-01-24 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2018-12-04 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee January 3. |
2018-12-03 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 10149 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 19402 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 8589.71 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 8870 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 8871 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 8899.10 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |