CA AB1017 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on September 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-05 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 233, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on September 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-05 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 233, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 1202.4 to the Public Utilities Code, relating to railroads.
Title
New or modified railroad crossings: approval.
Sponsors
Asm. Tasha Boerner Horvath [D] | Asm. Steven Choi [R] | Sen. Cathleen Galgiani [D] | Asm. Ash Kalra [D] |
Sen. Lena Gonzalez [D] | Asm. Miguel Santiago [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-08-22 - Assembly - AB 1017 Boerner Horvath Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-19 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1017 Boerner Horvath et a By Gonzalez (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-09 - Assembly - AB 1017 Boerner Horvath Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to tn, Quirk, Reyes, Santiago, Ting (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-19 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1017 Boerner Horvath et a By Gonzalez (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-09 - Assembly - AB 1017 Boerner Horvath Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to tn, Quirk, Reyes, Santiago, Ting (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-05 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 233, Statutes of 2019. | |
2019-09-05 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2019-08-27 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2019-08-22 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 2798.). |
2019-08-19 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 21 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2019-08-19 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2205.). |
2019-08-13 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-08-12 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2019-07-09 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-07-08 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2019-06-18 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Referred to Com. on E., U. & C. |
2019-05-09 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2019-05-09 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1590.) |
2019-05-02 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2019-05-01 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (May 1). |
2019-04-24 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-04-23 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2019-04-22 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 10). |
2019-03-26 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2019-03-07 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on U. & E. |
2019-02-22 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 24. |
2019-02-21 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Utilities Code | 1202.4 | New Code | See Bill Text |