CA AB105 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-08 - In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
Pending: Assembly Revenue and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-08 - In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
Pending: Assembly Revenue and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 73 of, to amend, repeal, and add Sections 105 and 106 of, and to add Chapter 4.5 (commencing with Section 83) to Part 0.5 of Division 1 of, the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to taxation, to take effect immediately, tax levy.
Title
Change in ownership: nonresidential active solar energy systems: initiative.
Sponsors
Asm. Philip Ting [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-06-25 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB105 Ting (Y: 28 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-24 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Assembly - AB 105 Ting Assembly Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 13 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-24 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Assembly - AB 105 Ting Assembly Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 13 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-08 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2020-06-26 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. |
2020-06-25 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after June 27 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2020-06-25 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 28. Noes 11. Page 3857.). |
2020-06-24 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-06-24 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 5.) (June 24). |
2020-06-22 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2019-06-26 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2019-06-24 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-06-20 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2019-06-19 | Senate | Ordered to third reading. |
2019-06-19 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 3.) (June 19). |
2019-06-17 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2019-06-14 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2019-06-12 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2019-06-10 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2019-04-11 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2019-04-11 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 54. Noes 13. Page 1180.) |
2019-04-08 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-04-04 | Assembly | Ordered to second reading. |
2019-04-04 | Assembly | Withdrawn from committee. |
2019-04-04 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 96 suspended. (Ayes 53. Noes 15. Page 1032.) |
2019-01-24 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2018-12-04 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee January 3. |
2018-12-03 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Revenue and Taxation Code | 105 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 106 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 73 | Amended Code | Citation Text |