CA AB1061 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-12 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 817, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-12 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 817, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 16010.7 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to foster care.
Title
Foster care.
Sponsors
Asm. Mike Gipson [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-09-10 - Assembly - AB 1061 Gipson Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-09 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1061 Gipson By Wiener (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-15 - Senate - Consent Calendar AB1061 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-02 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-10 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Public Safety] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Assembly - AB 1061 Gipson Assembly Third Reading (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-09 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1061 Gipson By Wiener (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-15 - Senate - Consent Calendar AB1061 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-02 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-10 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Public Safety] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Assembly - AB 1061 Gipson Assembly Third Reading (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-12 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 817, Statutes of 2019. | |
2019-10-12 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2019-09-19 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2019-09-10 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3308.). |
2019-09-10 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 3252.) |
2019-09-09 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 11 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2019-09-09 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2701.). |
2019-09-04 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-09-03 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2019-09-03 | Senate | Ordered to third reading. |
2019-09-03 | Senate | Action rescinded whereby the bill was read third time, passed, and to Assembly. |
2019-08-23 | Senate | In Senate. Held at Desk. |
2019-08-22 | Assembly | Ordered to the Senate. |
2019-08-15 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 17 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2019-08-15 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 2183.). |
2019-08-13 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2019-08-12 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2019-07-02 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-06-20 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2019-06-11 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 10). Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on HUMAN S. and PUB. S. |
2019-05-23 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2019-05-22 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1824.) |
2019-05-20 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (May 16). |
2019-04-24 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2019-04-03 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-04-02 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2019-04-01 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (March 26). |
2019-03-07 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HUM. S. |
2019-02-22 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 24. |
2019-02-21 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Welfare and Institutions Code | 16010.7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |