CA AB1064 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on February 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-03 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on February 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-03 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 26800 of, and to add Section 26925 to, the Penal Code, relating to firearms.
Title
Firearms dealers: conduct of business.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Privacy and Consumer Protection] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-03 | Assembly | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2020-01-31 | Assembly | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | In committee: Held under submission. |
2019-05-01 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2019-04-23 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-04-22 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96(a). |
2019-04-22 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2019-04-11 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on P. & C.P. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 9). |
2019-04-02 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2019-03-07 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and P. & C.P. |
2019-02-22 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 24. |
2019-02-21 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 26800 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 26925 | New Code | See Bill Text |