CA AB1066 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on September 24 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-24 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on September 24 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-24 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 1093 of, and to add Section 1120 to, the Unemployment Insurance Code, relating to unemployment benefits.
Title
Unemployment compensation: benefits payable: collection.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-08-31 - Assembly - AB 1066 GONZALEZ Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 54 N: 17 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-31 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1066 Gonzalez By Skinner (Y: 25 N: 10 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-31 - Assembly - With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-17 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-05 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-14 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1066 Gonzalez et al. By Leyva Reconsider (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-14 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1066 Gonzalez et al. By Leyva (Y: 19 N: 14 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-13 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1066 Gonzalez et al. By Leyva Reconsider (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-13 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1066 Gonzalez et al. By Leyva (Y: 19 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-12 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-10 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Assembly - AB 1066 Gonzalez Assembly Third Reading (Y: 51 N: 19 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-31 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1066 Gonzalez By Skinner (Y: 25 N: 10 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-31 - Assembly - With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-17 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-05 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-14 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1066 Gonzalez et al. By Leyva Reconsider (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-14 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1066 Gonzalez et al. By Leyva (Y: 19 N: 14 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-13 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1066 Gonzalez et al. By Leyva Reconsider (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-13 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1066 Gonzalez et al. By Leyva (Y: 19 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-12 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-10 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Assembly - AB 1066 Gonzalez Assembly Third Reading (Y: 51 N: 19 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-24 | Vetoed by Governor. | |
2020-09-14 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2020-08-31 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 54. Noes 17. Page 5505.). |
2020-08-31 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 57. Noes 16. Page 5498.) |
2020-08-31 | Assembly | From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (August 31). |
2020-08-31 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 5456.) |
2020-08-31 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on INS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. |
2020-08-31 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2020-08-31 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 25. Noes 10.). |
2020-08-24 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-08-20 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2020-08-20 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 20). |
2020-08-17 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2020-08-07 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-08-06 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (August 5). |
2020-07-02 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R. |
2020-07-02 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(c). |
2020-07-01 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-06-30 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2020-06-30 | Senate | Ordered to second reading. |
2020-06-30 | Senate | From inactive file. |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Leyva. |
2019-09-14 | Senate | Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 31. Noes 0. Page 2959.) |
2019-09-14 | Senate | Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 19. Noes 14. Page 2959.). |
2019-09-03 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-08-30 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2019-08-30 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 30). |
2019-08-12 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2019-07-10 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (July 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R. |
2019-05-23 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2019-05-22 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 51. Noes 19. Page 1825.) |
2019-05-20 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 3.) (May 16). |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 1760.) |
2019-05-15 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2019-05-13 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 1609.) |
2019-05-01 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-04-30 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2019-04-29 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 2.) (April 24). |
2019-04-23 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on INS. |
2019-04-22 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on INS. Read second time and amended. |
2019-03-27 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on INS. |
2019-03-26 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on INS. Read second time and amended. |
2019-03-25 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on INS. |
2019-02-22 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 24. |
2019-02-21 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Unemployment Insurance Code | 1093 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Unemployment Insurance Code | 1120 | New Code | See Bill Text |