CA AB1067 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-03 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-03 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Chapter 2.3 (commencing with Section 5390) to Division 5 of the Public Resources Code, relating to public lands.
Title
Public lands: Department of Parks and Recreation: wildfire management plan: fire hazard severity zones.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Natural Resources] (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Natural Resources] (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-03 | Assembly | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2020-01-31 | Assembly | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | In committee: Held under submission. |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 1760.) |
2019-05-15 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2019-05-13 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 1609.) |
2019-04-30 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-04-29 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2019-04-25 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 22). |
2019-03-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (March 26). Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2019-03-07 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on W., P., & W. and NAT. RES. |
2019-02-22 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 24. |
2019-02-21 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Resources Code | 5390 | New Code | See Bill Text |