CA AB1080 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-04 - Held at Desk pursuant to Joint Rule 51(b)(3).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-04 - Held at Desk pursuant to Joint Rule 51(b)(3).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 23671 of the Business and Professions Code, and to add Chapter 3 (commencing with Section 42040) to Part 3 of Division 30 of, and to add and repeal Chapter 6 (commencing with Section 48710) of Part 7 of Division 30 of, the Public Resources Code, relating to solid waste.
Title
Solid waste: packaging and products.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-08-30 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1080 Gonzalez et al. By Allen (Y: 23 N: 12 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-10 - Senate - That the measure be returned to Senate Floor for consideration. Ordered to third reading (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-26 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-03 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Assembly - AB 1080 Gonzalez Assembly Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 19 NV: 17 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Result (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-10 - Senate - That the measure be returned to Senate Floor for consideration. Ordered to third reading (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-26 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-03 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Assembly - AB 1080 Gonzalez Assembly Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 19 NV: 17 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Result (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-04 | Assembly | Held at Desk pursuant to Joint Rule 51(b)(3). |
2020-09-04 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2020-08-30 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 23. Noes 12.). |
2020-08-26 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-08-25 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2020-08-19 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-08-18 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2020-08-18 | Senate | Ordered to second reading. |
2020-08-18 | Senate | From inactive file. |
2019-09-14 | Senate | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Bradford. |
2019-09-10 | Senate | From committee: That the measure be returned to Senate Floor for consideration. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (September 10) |
2019-09-09 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on EQ. |
2019-09-09 | Senate | Senate Rule 29.3(b) suspended. (Ayes 29. Noes 7. Page 2690.) |
2019-09-09 | Senate | From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on EQ. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(b). (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on EQ. |
2019-09-09 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(b). |
2019-09-09 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-09-06 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2019-08-30 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-08-30 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (August 30). |
2019-08-26 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2019-08-15 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2019-08-14 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-08-07 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2019-07-11 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-07-05 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-07-03 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (July 3). |
2019-06-20 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on EQ. |
2019-06-12 | Senate | Referred to Com. on EQ. |
2019-05-30 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 44. Noes 19. Page 2151.) |
2019-05-22 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 1825.) |
2019-05-20 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (May 16). |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 1760.) |
2019-05-15 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2019-05-13 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 1609.) |
2019-05-08 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-05-07 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended. |
2019-03-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 3.) (March 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-03-26 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2019-03-20 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2019-03-19 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended. |
2019-03-07 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2019-02-22 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 24. |
2019-02-21 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 23671 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 42040 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Resources Code | 48710 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |