CA AB1082 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 24 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-24 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 122, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 19805 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to gambling.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Gambling: Gambling Control Act.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-08-30 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1082 Low By Rubio (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-09 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - Assembly - AB 1082 Low Assembly Third Reading (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-09-24 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 122, Statutes of 2020.
2020-09-24 Approved by the Governor.
2020-09-04AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m.
2020-08-30AssemblyIn Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
2020-08-30SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0.).
2020-08-28SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2020-08-27SenateOrdered to second reading.
2020-08-27SenateFrom inactive file.
2019-07-11SenateOrdered to inactive file at the request of Senator Dodd.
2019-07-11SenateFrom Consent Calendar.
2019-07-10SenateRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2019-07-09SenateFrom committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (July 9).
2019-05-08SenateReferred to Com. on G.O.
2019-04-25SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2019-04-25AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1349.)
2019-04-08AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-04-04AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (April 3).
2019-03-07AssemblyReferred to Com. on G.O.
2019-02-22AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 24.
2019-02-21AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Business and Professions Code19805Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback