CA AB1111 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 29 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-08-30 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 29 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-08-30 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add and repeal Division 14.8 (commencing with Section 23000) of the Public Resources Code, relating to outdoor recreation.
Title
Outdoor recreation: Office of Outdoor Recreation: California Outdoor Recreation Account.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-08-19 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-09 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Governmental Organization] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Assembly - AB 1111 Friedman Assembly Third Reading (Y: 72 N: 3 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-09 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Governmental Organization] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Assembly - AB 1111 Friedman Assembly Third Reading (Y: 72 N: 3 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-30 | Senate | In committee: Held under submission. |
2019-08-19 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2019-08-12 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-07-31 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2019-07-11 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-07-10 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (July 9). |
2019-07-02 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on G.O. |
2019-07-01 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on G.O. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 25). |
2019-06-12 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on N.R. & W. and G.O. |
2019-05-30 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2019-05-29 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 72. Noes 3. Page 2108.) |
2019-05-21 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-05-20 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2019-05-20 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 16). |
2019-04-03 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2019-03-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (March 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-03-19 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on W., P., & W. |
2019-03-18 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on W., P., & W. Read second time and amended. |
2019-03-07 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on W., P., & W. |
2019-02-22 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 24. |
2019-02-21 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Resources Code | 23000 | New Code | See Bill Text |