CA AB1118 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-12 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 820, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 9101.1 to the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to land use.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Land use: livability issues for older adults.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-09-12 - Assembly - AB 1118 Blanca Rubio Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-11 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1118 Blanca Rubio By Hueso (Y: 32 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-09 - Senate - That the measure be returned to Senate Floor for consideration. Ordered to third reading (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-01 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-28 - Assembly - AB 1118 Blanca Rubio Assembly Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 14 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-10-12 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 820, Statutes of 2019.
2019-10-12 Approved by the Governor.
2019-09-24AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
2019-09-12AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 3490.).
2019-09-11AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
2019-09-11SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 32. Noes 6. Page 2862.).
2019-09-09SenateFrom committee: That the measure be returned to Senate Floor for consideration. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (September 9)
2019-09-05SenateFrom committee: Be re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(b). (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S.
2019-09-05SenateRe-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(b).
2019-09-05SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-09-04SenateRead third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2019-08-30SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-08-30SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (August 30).
2019-07-01SenateIn committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2019-06-20SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-06-12SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
2019-06-06SenateReferred to Com. on GOV. & F.
2019-05-29SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2019-05-28AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 60. Noes 14. Page 2008.)
2019-04-11AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-04-10AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (April 10).
2019-04-04AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-03-07AssemblyReferred to Com. on L. GOV.
2019-02-22AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 24.
2019-02-21AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code65040.2Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code9101.1New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback