CA AB1124 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 266, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 266, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add and repeal Section 1343.3 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to health care service plans.
Title
Health care service plans: regulations: exemptions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-08-31 - Assembly - AB 1124 Maienschein Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-31 - Assembly - With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-30 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1124 Maienschein By Portantino (Y: 29 N: 6 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-20 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-17 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-10 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - Assembly - AB 1124 Maienschein Third Reading Urgency (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 14 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-31 - Assembly - With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-30 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1124 Maienschein By Portantino (Y: 29 N: 6 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-20 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-17 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-10 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - Assembly - AB 1124 Maienschein Third Reading Urgency (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 14 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-29 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 266, Statutes of 2020. | |
2020-09-29 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2020-09-14 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2020-08-31 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 71. Noes 0. Page 5477.). |
2020-08-31 | Assembly | From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (August 31). |
2020-08-30 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 5372.) |
2020-08-30 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. |
2020-08-30 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2020-08-30 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 29. Noes 6.). |
2020-08-26 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-08-25 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2020-08-20 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-08-20 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 20). |
2020-08-17 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2020-08-12 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-08-11 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 10). |
2020-07-01 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2020-06-24 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(c). |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Ordered to second reading. |
2020-03-11 | Senate | From inactive file. |
2019-08-15 | Senate | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator McGuire. |
2019-07-02 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-07-01 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2019-06-25 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-06-24 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2019-06-12 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-06-05 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R. |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R. |
2019-05-06 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2019-05-06 | Assembly | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 66. Noes 0. Page 1509.). |
2019-04-25 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-04-24 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 4.) (April 24). |
2019-04-23 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-04-22 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended. |
2019-04-04 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-03-07 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on L. & E. |
2019-02-22 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 24. |
2019-02-21 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 1343.3 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |