CA AB1140 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-30 - Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 5375.).
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 20508.5 to the Government Code, relating to public employees’ retirement.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public Employees’ Retirement System: contracting agencies: consolidation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-08-30 - Assembly - AB 1140 Mark Stone Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-30 - Assembly - With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-24 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1140 Mark Stone et al. By Monning (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-05 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - Assembly - AB 1140 Mark Stone Assembly Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 17 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 13 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 14 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-08-30 Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 5375.).
2020-09-11 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 65, Statutes of 2020.
2020-09-11 Approved by the Governor.
2020-09-08AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
2020-08-30AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling.
2020-08-30AssemblyFrom committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (August 30).
2020-08-26AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on P.E. & R. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
2020-08-24AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 26 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2020-08-24SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0.).
2020-08-14SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2020-08-13SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
2020-08-06SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (August 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2020-07-01SenateRe-referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R.
2020-06-18SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2020-06-17SenateReferred to Com. on RLS.
2020-01-28SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2020-01-27AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 55. Noes 17. Page 3906.)
2020-01-27AssemblyAssembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 58. Noes 18. Page 3893.)
2020-01-27AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2020-01-23AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2020-01-23AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 13. Noes 5.) (January 23).
2019-05-16AssemblyIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2019-05-16AssemblyJoint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 1760.)
2019-05-15AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2019-05-13AssemblyJoint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 1609.)
2019-04-24AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 5.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-04-23AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on B. & P.
2019-04-22AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended.
2019-04-02AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on B. & P.
2019-04-01AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended.
2019-03-07AssemblyReferred to Com. on B. & P.
2019-02-22AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 24.
2019-02-21AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code20508.5New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback