CA AB1145 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 26 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-26 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 180, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 26 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-26 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 180, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 11165.1 of the Penal Code, relating to crimes.
Title
Child abuse: reportable conduct.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-08-28 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1145 Cristina Garcia By Wiener (Y: 28 N: 10 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-31 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - Assembly - AB 1145 Cristina Garcia Assembly Third Reading (Y: 47 N: 19 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 10 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-31 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - Assembly - AB 1145 Cristina Garcia Assembly Third Reading (Y: 47 N: 19 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 10 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-26 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 180, Statutes of 2020. | |
2020-09-26 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2020-09-04 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m. |
2020-08-28 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2020-08-28 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 28. Noes 10. Page 4398.). |
2020-08-14 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-08-13 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2020-08-01 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (July 31). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-06-23 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2020-01-28 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2020-01-27 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 47. Noes 19. Page 3895.) |
2020-01-23 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-01-23 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 10. Noes 6.) (January 23). |
2019-04-24 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2019-04-10 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2019-04-02 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-03-07 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2019-02-22 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 24. |
2019-02-21 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 11165.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |