CA AB1162 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 687, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 687, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Chapter 6.1 (commencing with Section 42372) to Part 3 of Division 30 of the Public Resources Code, relating to lodging establishments.
Title
Lodging establishments: personal care products: small plastic bottles.
Sponsors
Asm. Ash Kalra [D] | Asm. Mark Stone [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-09-09 - Assembly - AB 1162 Kalra Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 53 N: 21 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-05 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1162 Kalra et al. By Wiener (Y: 25 N: 11 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-12 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-09 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-26 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Governance and Finance] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Assembly - AB 1162 Kalra Assembly Third Reading (Y: 50 N: 24 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-05 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1162 Kalra et al. By Wiener (Y: 25 N: 11 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-12 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-09 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-26 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Governance and Finance] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Assembly - AB 1162 Kalra Assembly Third Reading (Y: 50 N: 24 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-09 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 687, Statutes of 2019. | |
2019-10-09 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2019-09-13 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2019-09-09 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 53. Noes 21. Page 3143.). |
2019-09-06 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 8 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2019-09-05 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 25. Noes 11. Page 2562.). |
2019-09-03 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-08-30 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2019-08-30 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 30). |
2019-08-12 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2019-07-11 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-07-10 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (July 9). |
2019-06-26 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2019-06-20 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on GOV. & F. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 19). Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2019-06-13 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on EQ. |
2019-06-12 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on EQ., GOV. & F. and JUD. |
2019-05-30 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2019-05-29 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 50. Noes 24. Page 2109.) |
2019-05-21 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-05-20 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2019-05-20 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (May 16). |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 1760.) |
2019-05-15 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2019-05-13 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 1609.) |
2019-05-13 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-05-09 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended. |
2019-04-23 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 3.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-04-22 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2019-04-11 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2019-04-10 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (April 8). |
2019-03-27 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2019-03-26 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended. |
2019-03-25 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on NAT. RES. and JUD. |
2019-02-22 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 24. |
2019-02-21 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Resources Code | 42372 | New Code | See Bill Text |