CA AB1215 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 579, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 579, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add and repeal Section 832.19 of the Penal Code, relating to law enforcement.
Title
Law enforcement: facial recognition and other biometric surveillance.
Sponsors
Asm. Philip Ting [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-09-12 - Assembly - AB 1215 Ting Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 47 N: 21 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-11 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1215 Ting By Bradford (Y: 22 N: 15 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-09 - Assembly - AB 1215 Ting Assembly Third Reading (Y: 45 N: 17 NV: 18 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-11 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1215 Ting By Bradford (Y: 22 N: 15 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-09 - Assembly - AB 1215 Ting Assembly Third Reading (Y: 45 N: 17 NV: 18 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-08 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 579, Statutes of 2019. | |
2019-10-08 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2019-09-25 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2019-09-12 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 47. Noes 21. Page 3511.). |
2019-09-11 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2019-09-11 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 22. Noes 15. Page 2808.). |
2019-09-09 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-09-06 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2019-08-28 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-08-27 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2019-06-12 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-06-11 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 11). |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2019-05-09 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2019-05-09 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 45. Noes 17. Page 1576.) |
2019-04-29 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-04-25 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2019-04-24 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (April 23). |
2019-04-09 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2019-04-08 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. |
2019-04-02 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2019-03-11 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2019-02-22 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 24. |
2019-02-21 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 832.19 | New Code | See Bill Text |