CA AB1217 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 29 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-08-19 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Senate Elections and Constitutional Amendments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Article 6 (commencing with Section 84551) to Chapter 4 of Title 9 of the Government Code, relating to the Political Reform Act of 1974, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Political Reform Act of 1974: electioneering and issue lobbying communications: disclosures.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-29 - Assembly - AB 1217 Mullin Assembly Third Reading (Y: 65 N: 4 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-08-19SenateIn committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2019-08-14SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
2019-07-08SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
2019-06-27SenateIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2019-06-12SenateReferred to Com. on E. & C.A.
2019-05-30SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2019-05-29AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 65. Noes 4. Page 2117.)
2019-05-20AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-05-16AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 2.) (May 16).
2019-05-08AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2019-04-30AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-04-29AssemblyRead second time and amended.
2019-04-25AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 25).
2019-04-23AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on E. & R.
2019-04-22AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E. & R. Read second time and amended.
2019-04-10AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2019-04-04AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on E. & R.
2019-04-03AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E. & R. Read second time and amended.
2019-03-11AssemblyReferred to Com. on E. & R.
2019-02-22AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 24.
2019-02-21AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code82015Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code82025Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code82040New CodeSee Bill Text
Government Code84501Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code84502Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code84503Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code84504Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code84504.1Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code84504.2Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code84504.3Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code84504.4Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code84504.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code84504.6Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code84506.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code84510Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code84551New CodeSee Bill Text
Government Code86116.6New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback