CA AB1227 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on October 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-07 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 558, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on October 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-07 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 558, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 51934 and 51950 of the Education Code, and to amend Sections 16524.6, 16524.7, 16524.8, and 16524.9 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to sexual abuse.
Title
Human Trafficking Prevention Education and Training Act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-09-14 - Assembly - AB 1227 Bonta Special Consent Calendar 1st Day Regular Session (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-14 - Senate - Special Consent Calendar # AB1227 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-01 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-21 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-11 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-21 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Human Services] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-30 - Assembly - AB 1227 BONTA Assembly Third Reading (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-26 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Education] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-14 - Senate - Special Consent Calendar # AB1227 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-01 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-21 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-11 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-21 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Human Services] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-30 - Assembly - AB 1227 BONTA Assembly Third Reading (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-26 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Education] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-10-07 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 558, Statutes of 2017. | |
2017-10-07 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2017-09-25 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 12 p.m. |
2017-09-14 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3425.). |
2017-09-14 | Assembly | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2017-09-14 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2017-09-14 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2910.). |
2017-09-12 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2017-09-11 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-09-08 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2017-09-05 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-09-01 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (September 1). |
2017-08-21 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2017-07-13 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-07-12 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 11). |
2017-06-21 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HUMAN S. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 21). Re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S. |
2017-06-08 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on ED. and HUMAN S. |
2017-05-30 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2017-05-30 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1836.) |
2017-05-26 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-05-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 26). |
2017-05-26 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2017-05-17 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2017-05-04 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-05-03 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2017-05-02 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 26). |
2017-04-19 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2017-04-18 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2017-04-17 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on ED. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 4). |
2017-03-09 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on HUM. S. and ED. |
2017-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. |
2017-02-17 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 51934 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 51950 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 11165.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 16524.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 16524.7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 16524.8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 16524.9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |