CA AB1231 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on September 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-30 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on September 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-30 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add and repeal Section 89509 of the Education Code, relating to public postsecondary education.
Title
Public postsecondary education: California State University: support staff employees: merit salary adjustments.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-08-28 - Assembly - AB 1231 WEBER Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 56 N: 22 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-23 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1231 Weber By Leyva (Y: 29 N: 8 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-25 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-09 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - Assembly - AB 1231 WEBER Assembly Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 20 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-18 - Assembly - Set, [First] hearing. Referred to suspense file (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-18 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-09 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-23 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1231 Weber By Leyva (Y: 29 N: 8 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-25 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-09 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - Assembly - AB 1231 WEBER Assembly Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 20 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-18 - Assembly - Set, [First] hearing. Referred to suspense file (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-18 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-09 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-30 | Vetoed by Governor. | |
2018-09-06 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2018-08-28 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 56. Noes 22. Page 6728.). |
2018-08-23 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 25 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2018-08-23 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 29. Noes 8. Page 5654.). |
2018-08-20 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-17 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2018-08-17 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 16). |
2018-06-25 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2018-05-16 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-05-15 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (May 9). |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2018-01-29 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2018-01-29 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 54. Noes 20. Page 3858.) |
2018-01-22 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-01-18 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (January 18). |
2018-01-18 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2018-01-09 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 3.) (January 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-01-04 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. Read second time and amended. |
2017-04-18 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2017-03-09 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. |
2017-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. |
2017-02-17 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 89509 | New Code | See Bill Text |