CA AB1254 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on October 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-12 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 766, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on October 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-12 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 766, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 4152, 4153, 4154, and 4181 of, and to add Sections 4156, 4157, and 4158 to, the Fish and Game Code, relating to bobcats.
Title
Bobcats: take prohibition: hunting season: management plan.
Sponsors
Sen. Sydney Kamlager-Dove [D] | Sen. Benjamin Allen [D] | Asm. Richard Bloom [D] | Asm. Tasha Boerner Horvath [D] |
Asm. Laura Friedman [D] | Sen. Cathleen Galgiani [D] | Sen. Anthony Portantino [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-09-10 - Assembly - AB 1254 Kamlager-Dove Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 57 N: 20 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-09 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1254 Kamlager-Dove et al. By Allen (Y: 31 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-12 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-09 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Assembly - AB 1254 Kamlager-Dove Assembly Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 21 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-09 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1254 Kamlager-Dove et al. By Allen (Y: 31 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-12 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-09 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Assembly - AB 1254 Kamlager-Dove Assembly Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 21 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-12 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 766, Statutes of 2019. | |
2019-10-12 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2019-09-19 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2019-09-10 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 57. Noes 20. Page 3282.). |
2019-09-10 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 3252.) |
2019-09-09 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 11 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2019-09-09 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 31. Noes 8. Page 2687.). |
2019-09-06 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-09-05 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2019-09-03 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-08-30 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2019-08-30 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (August 30). |
2019-08-12 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2019-07-11 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-07-10 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (July 9). |
2019-07-01 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W. |
2019-06-06 | Senate | Referred to Com. on N.R. & W. |
2019-05-24 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2019-05-23 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 54. Noes 21. Page 1882.) |
2019-05-20 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 5.) (May 16). |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2019-05-01 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2019-04-22 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-04-11 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2019-04-10 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 4.) (April 9). |
2019-04-01 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on W., P., & W. |
2019-03-28 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on W., P., & W. Read second time and amended. |
2019-03-28 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on W., P., & W. |
2019-02-22 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 24. |
2019-02-21 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Fish and Game Code | 4152 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Fish and Game Code | 4153 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Fish and Game Code | 4154 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Fish and Game Code | 4156 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Fish and Game Code | 4157 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Fish and Game Code | 4158 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Fish and Game Code | 4181 | Amended Code | Citation Text |