CA AB1263 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 30 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
Pending: Senate Business, Professions and Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 30 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
Pending: Senate Business, Professions and Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 1670.8.5 to the Civil Code, relating to business regulation.
Title
Contracts: consumer services: consumer complaints.
Sponsors
Asm. Evan Low [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-01-30 - Assembly - AB 1263 Low Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-14 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-14 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Privacy and Consumer Protection] (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - Assembly - Be re-referred to the Committees on [Business and Professions] and [Privacy and Consumer Protection] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-14 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-14 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Privacy and Consumer Protection] (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - Assembly - Be re-referred to the Committees on [Business and Professions] and [Privacy and Consumer Protection] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2020-01-30 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2020-01-30 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 3942.) |
2020-01-23 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2020-01-23 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (January 23). |
2020-01-15 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (January 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-01-14 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on P. & C.P. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (January 14). Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P. |
2020-01-13 | Assembly | From committee: Be re-referred to Coms. on B. & P. and P. & C.P. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (January 13). Re-referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2020-01-09 | Assembly | (pending re-refer to Com. on P. & C.P.) |
2020-01-09 | Assembly | (pending re-refer to Com. on B. & P.) |
2020-01-09 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 56 suspended. (Page 3769.) |
2020-01-09 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. |
2020-01-07 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on INS. |
2020-01-06 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on INS. Read second time and amended. |
2019-04-02 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on INS. |
2019-04-01 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on INS. Read second time and amended. |
2019-03-28 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on INS. and P. & C.P. |
2019-02-22 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 24. |
2019-02-21 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Civil Code | 1670.8.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |