CA AB1264 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on October 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 741, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on October 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 741, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 2242 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to healing arts, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Medical Practice Act: dangerous drugs: appropriate prior examination.
Sponsors
Asm. Cottie Petrie-Norris [D] | Asm. Tasha Boerner Horvath [D] | Asm. Laura Friedman [D] | Sen. Bob Wieckowski [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-09-11 - Assembly - AB 1264 Petrie-Norris Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-10 - Assembly - With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-03 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1264 Petrie-Norris et al. By Leyva Urgency Clause (Y: 35 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Assembly - AB 1264 Petrie-Norris Third Reading Urgency (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 16 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-10 - Assembly - With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-03 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1264 Petrie-Norris et al. By Leyva Urgency Clause (Y: 35 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Assembly - AB 1264 Petrie-Norris Third Reading Urgency (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 16 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-11 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 741, Statutes of 2019. | |
2019-10-11 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2019-09-24 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2019-09-11 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 71. Noes 0. Page 3373.). |
2019-09-10 | Assembly | From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (September 10). |
2019-09-05 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on B. & P. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. |
2019-09-03 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 5 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2019-09-03 | Senate | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 2. Page 2441.). |
2019-07-09 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-07-08 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2019-06-25 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2019-06-25 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-06-17 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 17). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-06-13 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2019-06-03 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2019-05-14 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2019-05-13 | Assembly | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 64. Noes 0. Page 1619.). |
2019-05-02 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-05-01 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 1). |
2019-05-01 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2019-04-24 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-04-23 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2019-04-22 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended. |
2019-03-27 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2019-03-26 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended. |
2019-03-25 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2019-02-22 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 24. |
2019-02-21 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 2242 | Amended Code | Citation Text |