CA AB1291 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-12 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 826, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 26051.5 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to cannabis.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Adult-use cannabis and medicinal cannabis: license application: labor peace agreements.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-09-09 - Assembly - AB 1291 Jones-Sawyer Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 63 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-05 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1291 Jones-Sawyer By Caballero (Y: 31 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-12 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-26 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Labor, Public Employment and Retirement ] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - AB 1291 Jones-Sawyer Assembly Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 15 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Labor and Employment] (Y: 15 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-10-12 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 826, Statutes of 2019.
2019-10-12 Approved by the Governor.
2019-09-17AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
2019-09-09AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 63. Noes 14. Page 3146.).
2019-09-06AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 8 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2019-09-05SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 31. Noes 9. Page 2584.).
2019-09-03SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-08-30SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2019-08-30SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 30).
2019-08-12SenateIn committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2019-06-26SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-06-20SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R.
2019-06-19SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on L., P.E. & R. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 17).
2019-05-29SenateReferred to Coms. on B., P. & E.D. and L., P.E. & R.
2019-05-16SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2019-05-16AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 57. Noes 15. Page 1766.)
2019-05-09AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-05-08AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 5.) (May 8).
2019-04-25AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-03-26AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on L. & E. (Ayes 15. Noes 3.) (March 26). Re-referred to Com. on L. & E.
2019-03-11AssemblyReferred to Coms. on B. & P. and L. & E.
2019-02-22AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 24.
2019-02-21AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Business and Professions Code26051.5Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback