CA AB13 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on February 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-03 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on February 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-03 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Part 70.5 (commencing with Section 101300) to Division 14 of Title 3 of the Education Code, relating to education finance, by providing the funds necessary therefor through an election for the issuance and sale of bonds of the State of California and for the handling and disposition of those funds.
Title
Education finance: Higher Education Facilities Bond Act of 2020.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-03 | Assembly | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2020-01-31 | Assembly | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. |
2019-01-17 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. |
2018-12-04 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee January 3. |
2018-12-03 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 101300 | New Code | See Bill Text |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200AB13 |
Text | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200AB13 |