CA AB1316 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-03 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-03 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Title 15.5 (commencing with Section 3200) to Part 4 of Division 3 of the Civil Code, relating to the internet.
Title
Internet: social media or search engine service: censorship.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-01 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Arts, Entertainment, Sports, Tourism, and Internet Media] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Arts, Entertainment, Sports, Tourism, and Internet Media] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-03 | Assembly | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2020-01-31 | Assembly | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. |
2019-05-28 | Assembly | (Ayes 51. Noes 17. Page 2007.) |
2019-05-28 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 97. |
2019-05-24 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 1983.) |
2019-05-24 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 69 suspended. (Page 1982.) |
2019-05-02 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-05-01 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (May 1). |
2019-04-30 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on A.,E.,S.,T., & I.M. |
2019-04-29 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on A.,E.,S.,T., & I.M. Read second time and amended. |
2019-04-24 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on A.,E.,S.,T., & I.M. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on A.,E.,S.,T., & I.M. |
2019-04-22 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P. |
2019-04-12 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on P. & C.P. Read second time and amended. |
2019-03-11 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on P. & C.P. and A.,E.,S.,T., & I.M. |
2019-02-25 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2019-02-23 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 25. |
2019-02-22 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Civil Code | 3200 | New Code | See Bill Text |