CA AB1324 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 13 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-01 - Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 13 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-01 - Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 1257.3 to the Health and Safety Code, relating to health facilities.
Title
Health facilities: pandemics and emergencies: best practices.
Sponsors
Asm. Marc Levine [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-10 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Assembly - AB 1324 Levine Assembly Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 12 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Assembly - AB 1324 Levine Assembly Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 12 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-01 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2020-05-29 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2020-05-29 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. |
2020-05-28 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2019-07-08 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2019-06-11 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 10). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on HUMAN S. and JUD. |
2019-05-14 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2019-05-13 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 59. Noes 12. Page 1631.) |
2019-05-09 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-05-08 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 4.) (May 8). |
2019-04-25 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-04-24 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2019-04-23 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 3.) (April 23). |
2019-04-10 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (April 9). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2019-03-11 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on HUM. S. and JUD. |
2019-02-25 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2019-02-23 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 25. |
2019-02-22 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 1257.3 | New Code | See Bill Text |