CA AB1341 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 22 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-08-30 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 22 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-08-30 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 94801.5 of, and to add Sections 94850.2, 94858.5, and 94874.1 to, the Education Code, relating to private postsecondary education.
Title
Private postsecondary education: California Private Postsecondary Education Act of 2009.
Sponsors
Asm. Rebecca Bauer-Kahan [D] | Asm. Marc Berman [D] | Asm. David Chiu [D] | Sen. Susan Eggman [D] |
Asm. Evan Low [D] | Asm. Kevin McCarty [D] | Asm. Todd Gloria [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-08-12 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-10 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-01 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Education] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Assembly - AB 1341 Berman Assembly Third Reading (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Business and Professions] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-10 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-01 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Education] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Assembly - AB 1341 Berman Assembly Third Reading (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Business and Professions] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-30 | Senate | In committee: Held under submission. |
2019-08-12 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2019-07-10 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (July 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-07-01 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on ED. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 1). Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2019-06-27 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2019-06-17 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on B., P. & E.D. and ED. |
2019-05-23 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2019-05-22 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1798.) |
2019-05-20 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (May 16). |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 1760.) |
2019-05-15 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2019-05-13 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 1609.) |
2019-04-24 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-04-10 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 9). Re-referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2019-04-10 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2019-03-14 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. |
2019-02-25 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2019-02-23 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 25. |
2019-02-22 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 94801.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 94850.2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Education Code | 94858.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Education Code | 94874.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |