CA AB1350 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 66, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 66, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 51430 of the Education Code, relating to high school diplomas.
Title
Retroactive grant of high school diplomas: COVID-19 crisis.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-08-30 - Assembly - AB 1350 Gonzalez Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-28 - Senate - Consent Calendar AB1350 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-29 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - Assembly - AB 1350 Gonzalez Assembly Third Reading (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-28 - Senate - Consent Calendar AB1350 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-29 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - Assembly - AB 1350 Gonzalez Assembly Third Reading (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-11 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 66, Statutes of 2020. | |
2020-09-11 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2020-09-08 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m. |
2020-08-30 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 5321.). |
2020-08-28 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2020-08-28 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 4373.). |
2020-08-01 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2020-07-31 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 29). |
2020-07-01 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2020-06-17 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2020-06-17 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2020-01-28 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2020-01-27 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 3896.) |
2020-01-23 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-01-23 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (January 23). |
2020-01-16 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-01-15 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2020-01-14 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (January 13). |
2020-01-07 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2020-01-06 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended. |
2019-03-27 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2019-03-26 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended. |
2019-03-25 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2019-02-25 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2019-02-23 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 25. |
2019-02-22 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 51430 | Amended Code | Citation Text |