CA AB1353 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-07 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 542, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-07 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 542, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 45113 of the Education Code, relating to school employees.
Title
Classified employees: probationary period.
Sponsors
Asm. Buffy Wicks [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-09-03 - Assembly - AB 1353 Wicks Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 57 N: 19 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-22 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1353 Wicks By Monning (Y: 26 N: 11 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - AB 1353 Wicks Assembly Third Reading (Y: 52 N: 18 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-22 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1353 Wicks By Monning (Y: 26 N: 11 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - AB 1353 Wicks Assembly Third Reading (Y: 52 N: 18 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-07 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 542, Statutes of 2019. | |
2019-10-07 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2019-09-09 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2019-09-03 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 57. Noes 19. Page 2942.). |
2019-08-22 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 24 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2019-08-22 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 26. Noes 11. Page 2238.). |
2019-06-20 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-06-19 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (June 19). |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R. |
2019-05-16 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 52. Noes 18. Page 1764.) |
2019-04-25 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-04-24 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 24). |
2019-03-18 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on P.E. & R. |
2019-02-25 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2019-02-23 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 25. |
2019-02-22 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 45113 | Amended Code | Citation Text |