CA AB1356 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-03 - Died on third reading file.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 26200 of, and to add Section 26200.1 to, the Business and Professions Code, relating to cannabis.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Cannabis: local jurisdictions: retail commercial cannabis activity.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 10 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 12 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-03AssemblyDied on third reading file.
2020-01-22AssemblyOrdered to third reading.
2020-01-22AssemblyFrom inactive file.
2020-01-21AssemblyNotice of intention to remove from inactive file given by Assembly Member Ting.
2019-05-30AssemblyOrdered to inactive file at the request of Assembly Member Ting.
2019-05-20AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-05-16AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2019-05-16AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 10. Noes 7.) (May 16).
2019-05-08AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2019-05-01AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-04-30AssemblyRead second time and amended.
2019-04-29AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 7.) (April 23).
2019-04-08AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on B. & P.
2019-04-04AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended.
2019-03-14AssemblyReferred to Com. on B. & P.
2019-02-25AssemblyRead first time.
2019-02-23AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 25.
2019-02-22AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Business and Professions Code26200Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code26200.1New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback