CA AB1381 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 31 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-31 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 150, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 31 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-31 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 150, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 7670 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to professions and vocations.
Title
Funeral establishments: apprenticeship training.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-07-13 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd AB1381 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-18 - Assembly - AB 1381 OBERNOLTE Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-18 - Assembly - AB 1381 OBERNOLTE Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-31 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 150, Statutes of 2017. | |
2017-07-31 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2017-07-18 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 12:45 p.m. |
2017-07-13 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2017-07-13 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2024.). |
2017-07-11 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2017-07-10 | Senate | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. |
2017-06-19 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-06-01 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2017-05-18 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2017-05-18 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 69. Noes 0. Page 1619.) |
2017-05-11 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2017-05-10 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 10). |
2017-04-25 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-04-24 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2017-04-20 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 18). |
2017-03-13 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2017-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. |
2017-02-17 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 7670 | Amended Code | Citation Text |