CA AB139 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-26 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 335, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 65583, 65584.04, 65584.06, and 65588 of the Government Code, relating to housing.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Emergency and Transitional Housing Act of 2019.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-09-11 - Assembly - AB 139 Quirk-Silva Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-10 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB139 Quirk-Silva By Beall (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-12 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-02 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Assembly - AB 139 Quirk-Silva Assembly Third Reading (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-09-26 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 335, Statutes of 2019.
2019-09-26 Approved by the Governor.
2019-09-23AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
2019-09-11AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3394.).
2019-09-11AssemblyAssembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 3370.)
2019-09-10AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 12 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2019-09-10SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2738.).
2019-09-09SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-09-06SenateRead third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2019-09-03SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-08-30SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2019-08-30SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 30).
2019-08-12SenateIn committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2019-07-05SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-07-03SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (July 2).
2019-06-17SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HOUSING.
2019-06-06SenateReferred to Com. on HOUSING.
2019-05-24SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2019-05-23AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1857.)
2019-05-20AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-05-16AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (May 16).
2019-05-08AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2019-04-25AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-04-11AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
2019-04-10AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. Read second time and amended.
2019-01-24AssemblyReferred to Com. on H. & C.D.
2019-01-07AssemblyRead first time.
2018-12-12AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee January 11.
2018-12-11AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

Code Citations


California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback