CA AB1390 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 129, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 129, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 1000.7 of the Penal Code, relating to diversion.
Title
Deferred entry of judgment pilot program.
Sponsors
Asm. Mark Stone [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-07-08 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1390 Mark Stone By Hill (Y: 30 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - Assembly - AB 1390 Mark Stone Assembly Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 19 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - Assembly - AB 1390 Mark Stone Assembly Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 19 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-30 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 129, Statutes of 2019. | |
2019-07-30 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2019-07-19 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1:30 p.m. |
2019-07-09 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2019-07-08 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 30. Noes 8. Page 1991.). |
2019-06-12 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-06-11 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (June 11). |
2019-06-04 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2019-04-25 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 54. Noes 19. Page 1353.) |
2019-04-11 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-04-10 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (April 9). |
2019-03-20 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2019-03-19 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. |
2019-03-18 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2019-02-25 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2019-02-23 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 25. |
2019-02-22 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 1000.7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |