CA AB1416 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 29 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-07-09 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 29 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-07-09 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend, repeal, and add Section 1798.145 of the Civil Code, relating to consumer privacy.
Title
Business: collection and disclosures of consumer personal information.
Sponsors
Asm. Ken Cooley [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-29 - Assembly - AB 1416 Cooley Assembly Third Reading By DALY (Y: 47 N: 17 NV: 16 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-09 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2019-06-12 | Senate | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2019-05-30 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2019-05-29 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 47. Noes 17. Page 2127.) |
2019-05-07 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-05-06 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2019-05-02 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 30). |
2019-03-14 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on P. & C.P. |
2019-02-25 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2019-02-23 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 25. |
2019-02-22 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Civil Code | 1798.145 | Amended Code | Citation Text |