CA AB1426 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-25 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 168, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-25 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 168, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 5002.8 to the Public Resources Code, relating to public resources.
Title
Public resources: San Onofre State Beach: Richard H. and Donna O’Neill Conservancy: road construction.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-08-26 - Assembly - AB 1426 Boerner Horvath Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 61 N: 10 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-24 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1426 Boerner Horvath et al. By Monning (Y: 30 N: 4 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-05 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - Assembly - AB 1426 Boerner Horvath Assembly Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 16 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-24 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1426 Boerner Horvath et al. By Monning (Y: 30 N: 4 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-05 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - Assembly - AB 1426 Boerner Horvath Assembly Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 16 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-25 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 168, Statutes of 2020. | |
2020-09-25 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2020-08-31 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m. |
2020-08-26 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 61. Noes 10. Page 5225.). |
2020-08-24 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 26 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2020-08-24 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 30. Noes 4. Page 4291.). |
2020-08-14 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-08-13 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2020-08-05 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (August 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-07-01 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W. |
2020-06-17 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2020-06-17 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2020-01-28 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2020-01-27 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 58. Noes 16. Page 3907.) |
2020-01-27 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 58. Noes 18. Page 3893.) |
2020-01-27 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-01-23 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2020-01-23 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 13. Noes 2.) (January 23). |
2019-09-05 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-09-04 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended. |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2019-04-24 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2019-04-10 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 3.) (April 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-03-26 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on W., P., & W. |
2019-03-25 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on W., P., & W. Read second time and amended. |
2019-03-25 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on W., P., & W. |
2019-02-25 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2019-02-23 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 25. |
2019-02-22 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Resources Code | 5002.8 | New Code | See Bill Text |