CA AB1428 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 130, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 130, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Title 1.3.5 (commencing with Section 1748.40) to Part 4 of Division 3 of the Civil Code, relating to business.
Title
Business practices: prepaid credit cards: refund methods.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-07-08 - Assembly - AB 1428 Calderon Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-01 - Senate - Consent Calendar AB1428 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-09 - Assembly - AB 1428 Calderon Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Privacy and Consumer Protection] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-01 - Senate - Consent Calendar AB1428 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-09 - Assembly - AB 1428 Calderon Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Privacy and Consumer Protection] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-30 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 130, Statutes of 2019. | |
2019-07-30 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2019-07-19 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1:30 p.m. |
2019-07-08 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 2565.). |
2019-07-01 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after July 3 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2019-07-01 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1876.). |
2019-06-20 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2019-06-19 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 18). |
2019-05-24 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2019-05-09 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2019-05-09 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1587.) |
2019-05-02 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2019-05-01 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 30). |
2019-04-23 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on P. & C.P. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P. |
2019-03-14 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on B. & F. and P. & C.P. |
2019-02-25 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2019-02-23 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 25. |
2019-02-22 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Civil Code | 1748.40 | New Code | See Bill Text |