CA AB1436 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 29 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-08-20 - From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 20). Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 29 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-08-20 - From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 20). Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 798.56 of, and to add Title 19 (commencing with Section 3273.01) to Part 4 of Division 3 of, the Civil Code, and to amend Section 1161 of, and to add Chapter 5 (commencing with Section 1179.01) to Title 3 of Part 3 of, the Code of Civil Procedure, relating to COVID-19 relief.
Title
Tenancy: rental payment default: mortgage forbearance: state of emergency: COVID-19.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-08-20 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Rules] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-20 - Senate - [08-20-2020] set for [First] hearing: Reconsideration of favorable vote granted (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-20 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-19 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-18 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Rules] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Assembly - AB 1436 Mark Stone Assembly Third Reading (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-20 - Senate - [08-20-2020] set for [First] hearing: Reconsideration of favorable vote granted (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-20 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-19 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-18 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Rules] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Assembly - AB 1436 Mark Stone Assembly Third Reading (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-20 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 20). Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2020-08-20 | Senate | Reconsideration of favorable vote granted. |
2020-08-20 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. |
2020-08-19 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2020-08-18 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-08-18 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (August 18). Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2020-08-14 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2020-08-10 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2020-07-28 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2020-07-02 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2020-07-01 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2020-06-11 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2020-06-11 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. |
2020-06-10 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S. |
2019-06-12 | Senate | Referred to Com. on HUMAN S. |
2019-05-30 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2019-05-29 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 2098.) |
2019-05-20 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (May 16). |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 1760.) |
2019-05-15 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2019-05-13 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 1609.) |
2019-04-29 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-04-25 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2019-04-24 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 23). |
2019-03-28 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S. |
2019-03-27 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. Read second time and amended. |
2019-03-25 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HUM. S. |
2019-02-25 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2019-02-23 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 25. |
2019-02-22 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Code of Civil Procedure | 1161 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Code of Civil Procedure | 1179.01 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Civil Code | 3273.01 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Civil Code | 798.56 | Amended Code | Citation Text |