CA AB144 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-03 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-03 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 4630.2 of, to add Section 4005 to, and to add and repeal Section 75125.5 of, the Public Resources Code, relating to public resources.
Title
Public resources management: organic waste.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-08 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-03 | Assembly | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2020-01-31 | Assembly | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | In committee: Held under submission. |
2019-04-24 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2019-04-09 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-04-02 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2019-04-01 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended. |
2019-03-06 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2019-03-05 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended. |
2019-01-24 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2019-01-07 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2018-12-14 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee January 13. |
2018-12-13 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Resources Code | 4005 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Resources Code | 4630.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 75125.5 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |