CA AB1450 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 27 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-08-07 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted.
Pending: Senate Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 27 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-08-07 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted.
Pending: Senate Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 11169 and 11170 of, and to add Section 11169.5 to, the Penal Code, relating to child abuse.
Title
Child Abuse Central Index.
Sponsors
Asm. Tom Lackey [R] | Sen. Scott Wilk [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-08-07 - Senate - [First] hearing set for [08-07-2020]: Failed passage in Committee. Reconsideration granted (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-07 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 2 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-01-27 - Assembly - AB 1450 Lackey Assembly Third Reading (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-14 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Assembly - Reconsideration (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Human Services] (Y: 2 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-08-07 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 2 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-01-27 - Assembly - AB 1450 Lackey Assembly Third Reading (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-14 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Assembly - Reconsideration (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Human Services] (Y: 2 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-07 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted. |
2020-06-24 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2020-06-23 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2020-01-28 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2020-01-27 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 3897.) |
2020-01-23 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-01-23 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (January 23). |
2020-01-14 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (January 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-01-07 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2020-01-06 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. |
2019-04-09 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted. |
2019-03-14 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and HUM. S. |
2019-02-25 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2019-02-23 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 25. |
2019-02-22 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 11169 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 11169.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Penal Code | 11170 | Amended Code | Citation Text |