CA AB1458 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-29 - Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 32. Noes 5. Page 4435.).
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-29 - Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 32. Noes 5. Page 4435.).
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 26100 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to cannabis.
Title
Cannabis testing laboratories.
Sponsors
Asm. Bill Quirk [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-08-30 - Assembly - AB 1458 Quirk Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 62 N: 5 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-29 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1458 Quirk By Leyva (Y: 32 N: 5 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-20 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-13 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-08 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - Assembly - AB 1458 Quirk Assembly Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 9 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 13 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-14 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 15 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-29 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1458 Quirk By Leyva (Y: 32 N: 5 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-20 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-13 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-08 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - Assembly - AB 1458 Quirk Assembly Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 9 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 13 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-14 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 15 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-29 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 32. Noes 5. Page 4435.). | |
2020-09-29 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 269, Statutes of 2020. | |
2020-09-29 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2020-09-08 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m. |
2020-08-30 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 62. Noes 5. Page 5359.). |
2020-08-29 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2020-08-29 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 32. Noes 5.). |
2020-08-26 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-08-25 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2020-08-20 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-08-20 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 20). |
2020-08-13 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2020-08-10 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (August 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-06-23 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2020-01-28 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2020-01-27 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 59. Noes 9. Page 3908.) |
2020-01-27 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 58. Noes 18. Page 3893.) |
2020-01-27 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-01-23 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2020-01-23 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 13. Noes 3.) (January 23). |
2020-01-23 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2020-01-16 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-01-15 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2020-01-14 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 1.) (January 14). |
2019-04-23 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2019-04-22 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2019-04-12 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended. |
2019-04-01 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2019-03-28 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended. |
2019-03-28 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2019-02-25 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2019-02-23 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 25. |
2019-02-22 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 26100 | Amended Code | Citation Text |