CA AB1472 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 25 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-14 - From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 25 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-14 - From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 47 and 51.7 of the Civil Code, relating to civil law.
Title
Personal rights: false reports to law enforcement.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-09-12 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1472 Mark Stone By Galgiani Reconsider (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-12 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1472 Mark Stone By Galgiani (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-12 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-09 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-02 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - Assembly - AB 1472 Mark Stone Assembly Third Reading (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-12 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1472 Mark Stone By Galgiani (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-12 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-09 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-02 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - Assembly - AB 1472 Mark Stone Assembly Third Reading (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-14 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2020-07-01 | Senate | Re-referred to Coms. on JUD. and APPR. |
2020-06-25 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(c). |
2020-06-25 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-06-24 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2020-06-24 | Senate | Ordered to second reading. |
2020-06-24 | Senate | From inactive file. |
2019-09-12 | Senate | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Galgiani. |
2019-09-12 | Senate | Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2905.) |
2019-09-12 | Senate | Motion to reconsider made by Senator Galgiani. |
2019-09-12 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2899.). |
2019-08-13 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-08-12 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 12). |
2019-07-10 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (July 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-07-02 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (July 2). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2019-06-26 | Senate | Re-referred to Coms. on AGRI. and JUD. |
2019-06-19 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2019-04-25 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 1353.) |
2019-04-22 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-04-11 | Assembly | Ordered to second reading. |
2019-04-11 | Assembly | Withdrawn from committee. |
2019-04-09 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-04-08 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2019-04-04 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 2). |
2019-03-14 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on P. & C.P. |
2019-02-25 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2019-02-23 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 25. |
2019-02-22 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Civil Code | 47 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Civil Code | 51.7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |