CA AB1475 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-12 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 289, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 6702 and 6971 of the Public Contract Code, relating to public contracts.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Construction Manager/General Contractor method: transportation projects.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-08-30 - Assembly - AB 1475 Bauer-Kahan Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-26 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1475 Bauer-Kahan et al. By Glazer (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-25 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-09 - Assembly - AB 1475 Bauer-Kahan Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-09-12 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 289, Statutes of 2019.
2019-09-12 Approved by the Governor.
2019-09-05AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
2019-08-30AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 2888.).
2019-08-27AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 29 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2019-08-26SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2287.).
2019-08-19SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-08-15SenateRead third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2019-07-09SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-07-08SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
2019-06-25SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-06-11SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
2019-06-06SenateIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2019-05-22SenateReferred to Com. on TRANS.
2019-05-09SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2019-05-09AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1591.)
2019-05-02AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2019-05-01AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (May 1).
2019-04-23AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-04-22AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on TRANS.
2019-04-12AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended.
2019-03-20AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on TRANS.
2019-03-19AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended.
2019-03-14AssemblyReferred to Com. on TRANS.
2019-02-25AssemblyRead first time.
2019-02-23AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 25.
2019-02-22AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Public Contract Code6702Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Contract Code6971Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback