CA AB1486 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on October 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 664, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on October 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 664, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 54220, 54221, 54222, 54222.3, 54223, 54225, 54226, 54227, 54230.5, 54233, and 65583.2 of, and to add Sections 54230.6, 54233.5, 54234, 65400.1, and 65585.1 to, the Government Code, relating to surplus land.
Title
Surplus land.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-09-12 - Assembly - AB 1486 Ting Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 60 N: 17 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-11 - Senate - NVR (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-11 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1486 Ting et al. By Beall (Y: 28 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-12 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-02 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Governmental Organization] (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-26 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Housing] (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Assembly - AB 1486 Ting Assembly Third Reading (Y: 53 N: 20 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Housing and Community Development] (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-11 - Senate - NVR (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-11 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1486 Ting et al. By Beall (Y: 28 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-12 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-02 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Governmental Organization] (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-26 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Housing] (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Assembly - AB 1486 Ting Assembly Third Reading (Y: 53 N: 20 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Housing and Community Development] (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-09 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 664, Statutes of 2019. | |
2019-10-09 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2019-09-25 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2019-09-12 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 60. Noes 17. Page 3496.). |
2019-09-11 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2019-09-11 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 28. Noes 12. Page 2860.). |
2019-09-09 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-09-06 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2019-09-03 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-08-30 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2019-08-30 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 30). |
2019-08-12 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2019-07-03 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-07-03 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. |
2019-07-03 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on G.O. (Ayes 8. Noes 3.) (July 2). Re-referred to Com. on G.O. |
2019-06-27 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HOUSING. |
2019-06-26 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on HOUSING. (Ayes 4. Noes 3.) (June 26). |
2019-06-12 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on GOV. & F., HOUSING and G.O. |
2019-05-30 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2019-05-29 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 53. Noes 20. Page 2098.) |
2019-05-20 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (May 16). |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 1760.) |
2019-05-15 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2019-05-13 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 1609.) |
2019-04-25 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-04-25 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2019-04-22 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D. |
2019-04-11 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2019-04-10 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (April 10). |
2019-04-01 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2019-03-28 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended. |
2019-03-14 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2019-02-25 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2019-02-23 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 25. |
2019-02-22 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 54220 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 54221 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 54222 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 54222.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 54223 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 54225 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 54226 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 54227 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 54230.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 54230.6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 54233 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 54233.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 54234 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 65400.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 65583.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 65585.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |