CA AB1507 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on October 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-03 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 487, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on October 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-03 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 487, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 47605, 47605.1, and 60640 of the Education Code, relating to charter schools.
Title
Charter schools: location: resource center.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-09-12 - Assembly - AB 1507 Smith Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 57 N: 17 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-11 - Senate - Assemb (Y: 5 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-11 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1507 Smith et al. By Leyva (Y: 25 N: 12 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-19 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-10 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Assembly - AB 1507 Smith Assembly Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 18 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-11 - Senate - Assemb (Y: 5 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-11 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1507 Smith et al. By Leyva (Y: 25 N: 12 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-19 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-10 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Assembly - AB 1507 Smith Assembly Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 18 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-03 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 487, Statutes of 2019. | |
2019-10-03 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2019-09-25 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2019-09-12 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 57. Noes 17. Page 3482.). |
2019-09-11 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2019-09-11 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 25. Noes 12. Page 2836.). |
2019-09-06 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-09-05 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2019-09-03 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-08-30 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2019-08-30 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 30). |
2019-08-22 | Senate | Measure version as amended on August 13 corrected. |
2019-08-19 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2019-08-13 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-08-12 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 3.) (July 10). |
2019-07-01 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on ED. and APPR. |
2019-05-14 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2019-05-13 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 54. Noes 18. Page 1616.) |
2019-05-09 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 1563.) |
2019-04-23 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-04-22 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2019-04-11 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (April 10). |
2019-03-27 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2019-03-26 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended. |
2019-03-14 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2019-02-25 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2019-02-23 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 25. |
2019-02-22 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 47605 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 47605.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 60640 | Amended Code | Citation Text |