CA AB1516 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Vetoed on October 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-21 - Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on October 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-21 - Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 23010, 51182, and 51186 of the Government Code, and to amend Sections 4124.5, 4291, 4740, and 4741 of, to add Sections 4291.8 and 4295.6 to, and to add and repeal Sections 4291.5, 4291.6, and 4291.7 of, the Public Resources Code, relating to fire prevention.
Title
Fire prevention: wildfire risk: defensible space and fuels reduction management.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-09-11 - Assembly - AB 1516 Friedman Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-10 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1516 Friedman et al. By Dodd (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-19 - Senate - Result (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-19 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-10 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-25 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Energy, Utilities and Communications] (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Assembly - AB 1516 Friedman Assembly Third Reading (Y: 74 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Utilities and Energy] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-10 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1516 Friedman et al. By Dodd (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-19 - Senate - Result (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-19 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-10 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-25 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Energy, Utilities and Communications] (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Assembly - AB 1516 Friedman Assembly Third Reading (Y: 74 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Utilities and Energy] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-21 | Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file. | |
2019-10-13 | Vetoed by Governor. | |
2019-09-24 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2019-09-11 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 3390.). |
2019-09-11 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 3370.) |
2019-09-10 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 12 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2019-09-10 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 1. Page 2782.). |
2019-09-09 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-09-06 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2019-09-03 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-08-30 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2019-08-30 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (August 30). |
2019-08-19 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2019-08-12 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-08-07 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2019-07-10 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (July 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-07-03 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E., U. & C. |
2019-06-25 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on E., U. & C. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on E., U. & C. |
2019-06-11 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W. |
2019-06-06 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on N.R. & W. and E., U. & C. |
2019-05-24 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2019-05-23 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 1. Page 1895.) |
2019-05-20 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 1.) (May 16). |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 1760.) |
2019-05-15 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2019-05-13 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 1609.) |
2019-05-07 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-05-06 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended. |
2019-05-01 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-04-30 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2019-04-29 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 24). |
2019-04-22 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on U. & E. |
2019-04-11 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2019-04-10 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on U. & E. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 8). |
2019-04-01 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2019-03-28 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended. |
2019-03-18 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on NAT. RES. and U. & E. |
2019-02-25 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2019-02-23 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 25. |
2019-02-22 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 23010 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 51182 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 51186 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 4124.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 4291 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 4291.5 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 4291.6 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 4291.7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Resources Code | 4291.8 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Resources Code | 4295.6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Resources Code | 4740 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 4741 | Amended Code | Citation Text |