CA AB153 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on October 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 576, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 3003 of the Government Code, and to amend Section 532b of the Penal Code, relating to military fraud.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Military fraud.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-09-14 - Senate - Special Consent Calendar # AB153 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-01 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-10 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-27 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Veterans Affairs] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - Assembly - AB 153 CHÁVEZ Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-28 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Veterans Affairs] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-10-08 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 576, Statutes of 2017.
2017-10-08 Approved by the Governor.
2017-09-25AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 12 p.m.
2017-09-14AssemblyIn Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
2017-09-14SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2907.).
2017-09-12SenateOrdered to special consent calendar.
2017-09-05SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-09-01SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (September 1).
2017-07-10SenateIn committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2017-06-28SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-06-06SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on V.A. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 6). Re-referred to Com. on V.A.
2017-05-10SenateReferred to Coms. on PUB. S. and V.A.
2017-04-20SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2017-04-20AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 1142.)
2017-04-06AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2017-04-05AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (April 5).
2017-03-22AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (March 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-03-01AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on V.A. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (February 28). Re-referred to Com. on V.A.
2017-02-13AssemblyIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2017-01-30AssemblyReferred to Coms. on PUB. S. and V.A.
2017-01-12AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee February 11.
2017-01-11AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code3003Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code532Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback