CA AB1551 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on September 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-25 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 156, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 22684 of the Financial Code, and to amend Sections 5898.17 and 5913 of the Streets and Highways Code, relating to property assessments.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Property assessments: requirements and disclosures.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-08-30 - Assembly - AB 1551 Arambula Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-27 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1551 Arambula et al. By Caballero (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-13 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - Assembly - AB 1551 Arambula Assembly Third Reading (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Banking and Finance] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-09-25 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 156, Statutes of 2020.
2020-09-25 Approved by the Governor.
2020-09-08AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
2020-08-30AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling.
2020-08-27AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
2020-08-27SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 30. Noes 0.).
2020-08-25SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2020-08-24SenateRead third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2020-08-20SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2020-08-19SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
2020-08-17SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2020-08-13SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2020-07-30SenateIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2020-07-09SenateIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2020-06-23SenateReferred to Com. on B. & F.I.
2020-01-28SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2020-01-27AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 3898.)
2020-01-23AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2020-01-23AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (January 23).
2020-01-17AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2020-01-16AssemblyRead second time and amended.
2020-01-15AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (January 13).
2020-01-07AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on B. & F.
2020-01-06AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & F. Read second time and amended.
2019-04-11AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on B. & F. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 10). Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.
2019-04-02AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
2019-04-01AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended.
2019-04-01AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
2019-03-28AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended.
2019-03-28AssemblyReferred to Coms. on L. GOV. and B. & F.
2019-02-25AssemblyRead first time.
2019-02-23AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 25.
2019-02-22AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Financial Code22684Amended CodeCitation Text
Streets and Highways Code5898.17Amended CodeCitation Text
Streets and Highways Code5913Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback