CA AB1552 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 29 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-23 - From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E., U. & C.
Pending: Senate Energy, Utilities and Communications Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 29 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-23 - From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E., U. & C.
Pending: Senate Energy, Utilities and Communications Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 910.3 and 8283 of, and to add Article 4.5 (commencing with Section 800) to Chapter 4 of Part 1 of Division 1 of, the Public Utilities Code, relating to public utilities.
Title
Large public utilities: timely payment of subcontractors: women, minority, disabled veteran, and LGBT business enterprise procurement: late payment penalties.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-01-29 - Assembly - AB 1552 QUIRK-SILVA Assembly Third Reading (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-18 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-11 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-09 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Utilities and Energy] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-03 - Assembly - Be re-referred to the Committees on [Jobs, Economic Development, and the Economy] and [Utilities and Energy] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-18 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-11 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-09 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Utilities and Energy] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-03 - Assembly - Be re-referred to the Committees on [Jobs, Economic Development, and the Economy] and [Utilities and Energy] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-23 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E., U. & C. |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Referred to Com. on E., U. & C. |
2018-01-29 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2018-01-29 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 3864.) |
2018-01-23 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-01-22 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2018-01-18 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (January 18). |
2018-01-18 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2018-01-11 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (January 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-01-09 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on U. & E. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (January 9). Re-referred to Com. on U. & E. |
2018-01-08 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on J., E.D., & E. |
2018-01-04 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on J., E.D., & E. Read second time and amended. |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | (pending re-refer to Com. on U. & E.) |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 56 suspended. (Page 3677.) |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | From committee: Be re-referred to Coms. on J., E.D., & E. and U. & E. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (January 3). Re-referred to Com. on J., E.D., & E. |
2017-09-15 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. |
2017-09-13 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on U. & E. |
2017-09-12 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on U. & E. Read second time and amended. |
2017-03-16 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on U. & E. |
2017-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. |
2017-02-17 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Utilities Code | 354 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Utilities Code | 800 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Utilities Code | 8281 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 8283 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 8287 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Utilities Code | 910.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |